This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2020 at 05:12:20 (UTC).

DR CAR GLASS, LLC VS ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 DR CAR GLASS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACCREDITED SURETY AND CASUALTY COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR CAR GLASS, LLC

Assignor

Rojaslares, Johan J.

Defendant

Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Martin I

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

10/05/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

09/24/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

09/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

09/24/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

09/24/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2270114AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/05/2020 REGISTER#:227CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2710092AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:BERGER, MARTIN I 9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 850 MIAMI FL 33156-2800 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less