This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 15:21:03 (UTC).

DONNELL LEWIS VS JERMAINE SUAZO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 DONNELL LEWIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JERMAINE SUAZO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS, DONNELL

Defendants

SUAZO, JERMAINE

ALFONSO, NELSON ELMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

01/25/2022 - Notice of Trial (case at Issue)

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/18/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

01/07/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

01/07/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

01/07/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

01/07/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Taking Deposition

12/16/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Appearance

12/16/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/16/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

11/10/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

11/10/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/10/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

11/10/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

11/10/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

11/10/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

11/10/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Trial (case at Issue); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SUAZO JERMAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090215AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/11/2021REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge J Garcia