This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2021 at 08:10:40 (UTC).

DIUBER GONZALEZ VS APC PAINTING CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 DIUBER GONZALEZ filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against APC PAINTING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Diuber

Defendants

APC Painting Corporation

C & S Paint and Wallpaper Inc

Dueno Pamayo, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony M Georges-Pierre

Defendant Attorney

Twombly, Robert Y.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

08/24/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

08/09/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/29/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/27/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

07/21/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: C & S Paint and Wallpaper Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Dueno Pamayo Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: C & S Paint and Wallpaper Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Dueno Pamayo Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010040AMT PAID:$30.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2021 REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990045AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/23/2021 REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT Y TWOMBLY