This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/16/2022 at 08:39:06 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS WAFA JAUHARI

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WAFA JAUHARI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Jauhari, Wafa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Campos, Jeffrey S., ESQ

Dunn, Robert, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

06/29/2022 - Statement of Claim

SP Pretrial Date

08/03/2022 - SP Pretrial Date

Summons Returned - No Service

08/16/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

08/29/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Extension of Time

10/07/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

10/11/2022 - Order:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jauhari Wafa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF TO HAVE ADDITIONAL 90 DAYS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 11:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590008AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/10/2022REGISTER#:259CASHIER:YMAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jauhari Wafa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990024AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:CAMPOS, JEFFREY S., ESQ700 W HILLSBORO BLVD, BLDG 2 STE 201DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:07/02/2022REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2,366.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less