This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/11/2023 at 06:47:09 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS STEPHANIE M MOSS

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHANIE M MOSS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Moss, Stephanie M

Homestead, FL 33032-5824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campos, Jeffrey S., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Dunn, Robert, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

08/30/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

09/16/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

10/26/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Motion for Extension of Time

11/09/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Pre Trial Summons

11/14/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Order Extending Time for

11/14/2022 - Order Extending Time for

Summons Returned - No Service

12/01/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Memorandum of Disposition

01/12/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Extending Time for

01/18/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Voluntary Dismissal

01/26/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

01/26/2023 - Final Disposition Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33560:1293; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-2 10710S.W. 211th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560059AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/18/2022REGISTER#:256CASHIER:SAMM2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-2 10710S.W. 211th Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660011AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2022REGISTER#:266CASHIER:MARTHAV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Moss Stephanie M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080072AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:CAMPOS, JEFFREY S., ESQ700 W HILLSBORO BLVD, BLDG 2 STE 201DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:09/03/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less