This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/13/2020 at 01:14:04 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CHARLES T LYLE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES T LYLE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Lyle, Charles T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned - No Service

03/09/2020 - Summons Returned - No Service

Pre Trial Summons

02/20/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/14/2020 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2070020AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/25/2020 REGISTER#:207CASHIER:MATTIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lyle Charles T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500024AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $5,105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.