This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ALBEIRO A ESPINAL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALBEIRO A ESPINAL. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Espinal, Albeiro A

Hialeah, FL 33017-2981

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran D, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/18/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

02/18/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

02/24/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

03/10/2022 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

05/03/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

05/05/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Pre-Trials; Hearing Code: PT; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre-Trials; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESET PRETRIAL:07-18-2022, 9:30 A.M. IN PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 3:00PM; Hearing Location: Hialeah Courtroom 2-2 11 E. 6th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2690004AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2022REGISTER#:269CASHIER:MARLNEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Espinal Albeiro A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040066AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN D, ESQZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 W. HILLSBORO BLVD BDEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:02/19/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jovanovich, Zoran David