This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/06/2020 at 16:19:17 (UTC).

DIAZ, OLFA VS BONILLA, FRANCISCO A.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 DIAZ, OLFA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BONILLA, FRANCISCO A. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diaz, Olfa

Respondent

Bonilla, Francisco A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Corey, Joseph M., Jr

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

02/04/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 23-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Book/Page: 31808:2907; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2-4-20 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: FORWARD TO THE JUDGE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketFinal Disposition Document; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketProof; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF DILIGENT SEARCH RESULTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bonilla Francisco A.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.