Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/14/2021 at 07:59:28 (UTC).

DIAZ, MIGUEL ANGEL VS FIGUEIRAS, LUCIANA SANTI TULINI

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 DIAZ, MIGUEL ANGEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FIGUEIRAS, LUCIANA SANTI TULINI. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diaz, Miguel Angel

Respondent

Figueiras, Luciana Santi Tulini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert P Kelly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620036AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2021 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Figueiras Luciana Santi Tulini

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570008AMT PAID:$409.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/02/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT P KELLY