This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/21/2021 at 20:35:56 (UTC).

DIANE COLE ET AL VS MICHAEL I. GOLDBERG, AS RECEIVER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 DIANE COLE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MICHAEL I GOLDBERG, AS RECEIVER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLE, DIANE

RODRIGUEZ, RAYSA M.

ROSENTHAL, STEVEN

ZYR, LLC

Defendants

MICHAEL I. GOLDBERG, as Receiver

310 SURFSIDE LLC

8777 BC Holdings, LLC

8777-502 Collins Avenue, LLC

ABRAMSON, JANET

ADA C. LOPEZ, as Trustee of the Ada C. Lopez Trust

ADAL HOLDINGS, LLC

AGUERO, ADALBERTO

Aguero, Nieves Isabel

ALVAREZ, HORTENSIA

ALVAREZ, SUSANA

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

ANN CASERTA, as Trustee of Living Trust

Safadie de Apfelbaum, Julieta A.

Asset Acceptance, LLC

AZEN, NORMAN H.

268 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tropin, Harley Shepard

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

09/23/2021 - Lis Pendens

Complaint

09/22/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/05/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/04/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

568 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 426. Parties: Wodnicki Jean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 429. Parties: Zababa Champ LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 427. Parties: Wolf Ryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 424. Parties: Westport Recovery Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 425. Parties: Wodnicki Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
836 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32822:3887; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990122AMT PAID:$1,176.50NAME:TROPIN, HARLEY SHEPARD2525 PONCE DE LEON BLVD FL 9MIAMI FL 33134-6037COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$702.50$702.503142-RECORDING FEE1$68.00$68.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$1,176.50RECEIPT DATE:09/24/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32760:2282; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tropin, Harley Shepard