This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/14/2022 at 19:44:35 (UTC).

DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER OF THE TREASURE COAST, INC. VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER OF THE TREASURE COAST, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diagnostic Radiology Center Of The Treasure Coast, Inc.

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Assignee

Lamb, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

Defendant Attorney

Luque, Eliana A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/26/2022 - Statement of Claim

Motion:

07/13/2022 - Motion:

Request for Production

07/13/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

07/13/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

07/13/2022 - Request for Admissions

Motion:

07/13/2022 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

07/13/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/13/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

07/13/2022 - Request for Admissions

Motion to Strike

07/12/2022 - Motion to Strike

Notice of Interrogatory

07/12/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Admissions

07/05/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/05/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Request for Admissions

07/01/2022 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

07/01/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

07/01/2022 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

07/01/2022 - Request for Production

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110014AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/01/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120011AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/28/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER TREASURE COAST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Luque, Eliana A