This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/08/2022 at 12:14:25 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY VS FRED BOTWINIK ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FRED BOTWINIK. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

GSAA Home Equity Trust 2007-5 Mortgage Pass-Throug

Defendants

Botwinik, Fred

Ashley Condominium Corporation

Bieley, Peggy

Bieley (Tr), Peggy

Peggy Bieley Living Trust dated December 27,1993

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/22/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

11/22/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Lis Pendens

11/23/2021 - Lis Pendens

Email Notice:

11/22/2021 - Email Notice:

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/22/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Motion to Strike

12/30/2021 - Motion to Strike

Summons Returned - No Service

12/27/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

12/27/2021 - Summons Returned - No Service

Affidavit of Diligent Search

12/23/2021 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Service Return for Unknown Party

12/23/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

12/23/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

12/23/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Request for Production

12/17/2021 - Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/15/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

12/10/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Lis Pendens

11/23/2021 - Lis Pendens

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Botwinik Fred; Ashley Condominium Corporation; Bieley Peggy; Bieley (Tr) Peggy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060104AMT PAID:$1,911.00NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,911.00RECEIPT DATE:11/24/2021REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32874:2177; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ