This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 00:25:32 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE VS YOSNIEL FERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YOSNIEL FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

UNIVERSITY CREDIT UNION

FERNANDEZ, YOSNIEL

SEARS ROEBUCK & CO

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY FLORIDA

NATIONAL CHECK TRUST INC

WMC MORTGAGE CORP

DIAZ, MARIA ISABEL

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sahne Fuller

Thomas J Crowder

Defendant Attorneys

Russo, Adam G

Sherman, David Alan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

10/02/2021 - Notice of Change of Address

Response to Request for Admissions

09/27/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

09/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

09/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

09/15/2021 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

08/31/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Extension of Time

07/28/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/07/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order for Substitution of Counsel

06/30/2021 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/11/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/11/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/11/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/11/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

12/07/2020 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

12/07/2020 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

12/07/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/07/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

12/08/2020 - Lis Pendens

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Change of Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Thomas J Crowder; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FERNANDEZ YOSNIEL; DIAZ MARIA ISABEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550152AMT PAID:$925.00 NAME:SAHNE FULLER CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PO BOX 771270 CORAL SPRINGS FL 33077 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$10.00$10.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$925.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2020 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32241:3416; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@CLEGALGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CHECK TRUST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where WMC MORTGAGE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS ROEBUCK & COMPANY is a litigant