This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/15/2021 at 13:53:58 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE VS GUILLERMO L GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GUILLERMO L GARCIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

GARCIA, GUILLERMO

GOTHAM COLLECTION SERVICES CORP

GARCIA, GUILLERMO L

MOORS VILLAGE HOMES MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, I

MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC.

SARAVIA, LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

Defendant Attorney

Chadrow, Michael S

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

03/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

Voluntary Dismissal

03/23/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

03/23/2021 - Final Disposition Document

Complaint

03/05/2021 - Complaint

Certificate

03/05/2021 - Certificate

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

03/05/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

03/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

03/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/08/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32414:4705; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GARCIA GUILLERMO L; MOORS VILLAGE HOMES MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION I; MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC.; SARAVIA LARRY; GOTHAM COLLECTION SERVICES CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chadrow Michael S; MOORS VILLAGE HOMES MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MOORS VILLAGE HOMES MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32388:4762; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS MASTER MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gotham Collection Svcs Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant