This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/27/2020 at 22:26:25 (UTC).

DERRICK COLON VS THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 DERRICK COLON filed an Other lawsuit against THE STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellant

Colon, Derrick

Appellee

The State of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Manuel Alvarez

 

Court Documents

Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

10/30/2019 - Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

Order:

09/16/2019 - Order:

Motion:

08/20/2019 - Motion:

Record on Appeal.

08/13/2019 - Record on Appeal.

Order:

08/12/2019 - Order:

Affidavit of:

07/31/2019 - Affidavit of:

Motion for Extension to File Transcript

07/15/2019 - Motion for Extension to File Transcript

Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

05/29/2019 - Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

Motion for Extension to File Transcript

05/20/2019 - Motion for Extension to File Transcript

Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

09/17/2019 - Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order

Order of Withdrawal and Giving Appointment 30 Days to File S

09/16/2019 - Order of Withdrawal and Giving Appointment 30 Days to File S

Memorandum Brief of Appellant

08/27/2019 - Memorandum Brief of Appellant

Transcript of Proceedings Taken

07/31/2019 - Transcript of Proceedings Taken

Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

07/25/2019 - Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

06/21/2019 - Order Granting Extension for Court Reporter

Motion for Extension to File Transcript

06/18/2019 - Motion for Extension to File Transcript

Statement of Judicial Acts to be Reviewed

04/16/2019 - Statement of Judicial Acts to be Reviewed

Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

04/12/2019 - Acknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketClosed on Mandate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandate From Appeals Court; Book/Page: 31703:4175; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH OPINION ATTACHED Parties: Colon Derrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Motion; Hearing Code: MOTION; Hearing Time: 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: ATTORNEY FOR APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: 19-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER AND TO RE-ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Withdrawal and Giving Appointment 30 Days to File S; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANDERS I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Motion; Hearing Code: MOTION; Hearing Time: 3:10PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: ATTORNEY FOR APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension to File Transcript; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT REPORTER'S REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Extension for Court Reporter; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNTIL JULY 16, 2019 Due Date:07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension to File Transcript; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Extension for Court Reporter; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNTIL JUNE 16, 2019 Due Date:06/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension to File Transcript; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT REPORTER'S REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Judicial Acts to be Reviewed; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATION TO COURT REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgement Letter Mailed to Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRecord Assigned To; Event Type: Event; Comments: TANYA D. BENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal filed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketFiled at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less