This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/29/2022 at 11:10:34 (UTC).

DENISE JORDAN VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 DENISE JORDAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORDAN, DENISE

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Englander, Gary B

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/26/2022 - Complaint

Request for Production

09/26/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/26/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/30/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/04/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

10/10/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100006AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ENGLANDER, GARY B2404 NE 9TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304-3524COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/04/2022REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050095AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ENGLANDER, GARY B2404 NE 9TH STFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304-3524COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/28/2022REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Englander, Gary B