This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/11/2022 at 15:47:21 (UTC).

DEBBY DAVIGNER VS PHOENIX AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 DEBBY DAVIGNER filed an Other lawsuit against PHOENIX AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davigner, Debby

Defendant

Phoenix Automotive Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Holly K

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/03/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/03/2021 - Complaint

Order to Show Cause

12/09/2021 - Order to Show Cause

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/10/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

12/22/2021 - Service Returned

Motion to Dismiss

12/30/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

12/30/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

01/06/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Response to Motion

01/13/2022 - Response to Motion

AgreedOrder

01/28/2022 - AgreedOrder

Notice:

01/28/2022 - Notice:

Order of Dismissal

02/07/2022 - Order of Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33009:4655; Event Type: Event; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: RELEASING BOND FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT- RESPONDENTS CLAIM OF LIEN SHOULD BE ENFORCED BY ACTION OR VACATED DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JANUARY 25, 2022 VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Phoenix Automotive Services Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Phoenix Automotive Services Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Show Cause; Event Type: Event; Comments: HEARING SET FOR 1/7/22 AT 8:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3240164AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MILLER, HOLLY KKORIN LAW P.A. 80 SW 8TH STREET SUITE 2000MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/07/2021REGISTER#:324CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER , HOLLY K