This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:08:11 (UTC).

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS GLOBAL TAX & ACCOUNTING GROUP CORP

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GLOBAL TAX ACCOUNTING GROUP CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De Lage Landen Financial Services Inc

Defendant

Global Tax & Accounting Group Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric B Zwiebel

 

Court Documents

Foreign Judgment Filed

10/05/2022 - Foreign Judgment Filed

Affidavit of Foreign Judgment

10/05/2022 - Affidavit of Foreign Judgment

Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment

10/07/2022 - Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment

Affidavit of:

11/22/2022 - Affidavit of:

Notice of Compliance

11/22/2022 - Notice of Compliance

Returned Mail

12/15/2022 - Returned Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Returned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE 857 275 389 US (GLOBAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF COMPLIANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Registered Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE 857 275 389 US (GLOBAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of Notice and Judgment Mailed; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment; Book/Page: 33415:810; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670016AMT PAID:$658.70COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$190.00$190.003154-REGISTERED MAIL (11$25.70$25.703133-NOTICE OF RECORDIN1$42.00$42.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$658.70RECEIPT DATE:10/05/2022REGISTER#:267CASHIER:BEPEREZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Foreign Judgment; Book/Page: 33412:3347; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Foreign Judgment Filed; Book/Page: 33412:3380; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less