This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/09/2021 at 00:01:36 (UTC).

DAYNIER BORREGO VS BRICKLESS CONSTRUCTION CORP

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 DAYNIER BORREGO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BRICKLESS CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Borrego, Daynier

Defendant

Brickless Construction Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason S Remer

Hunt, Daniel H

Defendant Attorneys

Yotkova, Elitsa V

Crucet, Pablo L., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order on Case Management Plan

08/17/2021 - Order on Case Management Plan

Case Management Report

08/13/2021 - Case Management Report

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/12/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion:

08/09/2021 - Motion:

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

04/30/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Appearance

04/21/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

04/16/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/16/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/16/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

04/16/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/26/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Extending Time for

03/10/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

03/04/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/02/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

01/28/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Case Management Plan; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPROVED AND ADOPTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR STATUS CONFERENCE & REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Crucet Pablo L. ESQ; Brickless Construction Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hunt Daniel H; Borrego Daynier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Yotkova Elitsa V; Brickless Construction Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Due Date: 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Yotkova Elitsa V; Brickless Construction Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Brickless Construction Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580260AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JASON S REMER 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580062AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JASON S REMER 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130-6807 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunt, Daniel H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Remer, Jason S