Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/09/2021 at 03:36:19 (UTC).

DAVID HARREL VS ROBERT HOVAN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 DAVID HARREL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERT HOVAN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Joseph Caleb Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harrel, David

Defendant

Hovan, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Holland, Janelys, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

04/29/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

04/19/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Transfer

04/13/2021 - Motion to Transfer

Motion:

04/09/2021 - Motion:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/30/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Hearing-

03/24/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Amend

03/29/2021 - Motion to Amend

Notice of Hearing-

03/23/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Memorandum of Disposition

03/19/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

03/11/2021 - Service Returned

Reply to Answer

12/21/2020 - Reply to Answer

Memorandum of Disposition

12/18/2020 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion to Quash

12/18/2020 - Motion to Quash

Email Notice:

12/14/2020 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

12/14/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Motion:

11/05/2020 - Motion:

Pre Trial Summons

10/20/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Affidavit of Indigency

10/20/2020 - Affidavit of Indigency

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER DETERMINING TRIAL JUDGE OSCAR RODRIGUEZ-FONTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Recommended Transfer Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATE TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROPERTY DAMEGE COST AND RECIEPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Parties: Hovan Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DEF'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120045AMT PAID:$310.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENTTENDER AMT:$310.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/20/2020 REGISTER#:212CASHIER:ILIVEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS ATTACHED Parties: Hovan Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Indigency / Insolvency; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Hovan Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indigency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Caleb Center; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holland, Janelys, ESQ