This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 18:16:11 (UTC).

DANAY BLANCO VS ATLAS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 DANAY BLANCO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATLAS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLANCO, DANAY

Defendants

ATLAS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

MELROSE APARTMENTS II CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Macri, Jason

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

09/12/2022 - Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

09/06/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

09/06/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Order on Case Management Plan

09/02/2022 - Order on Case Management Plan

Case Management Report

09/02/2022 - Case Management Report

Notice of Appearance

08/24/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Order:

08/24/2022 - Order:

Default

08/18/2022 - Default

Motion for Default

08/17/2022 - Motion for Default

Request for Production

06/08/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/08/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/08/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/08/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/08/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/08/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

06/08/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/08/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral; Event Type: Event; Comments: 11-17-2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Case Management Plan; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Case Management Report; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES-DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ATLAS PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Macri, Jason