This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 23:27:53 (UTC).

DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS VICTORIA A FERGUSON

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTORIA A FERGUSON. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dade County Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Ferguson, Victoria A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kligler, Joshua C, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/23/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

06/10/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

06/20/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170004AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:217CASHIER:ADONATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ferguson Victoria A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080164AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:KLIGLER, JOSHUA C, ESQ66 WEST FLAGLER STREET SUITE #400MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant