This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 07:17:54 (UTC).

DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS LOURDES CORDONEDA

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOURDES CORDONEDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dade County Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Cordoneda, Lourdes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kligler, Joshua C, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/23/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/23/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

06/10/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

06/24/2022 - Service Returned

Order of Default

07/21/2022 - Order of Default

Non-Military Affidavit

07/21/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Memorandum of Disposition

07/25/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Default Judgment

07/27/2022 - Motion for Default Judgment

Default Final Judgment

08/05/2022 - Default Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33325:704; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cordoneda Lourdes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cordoneda Lourdes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170002AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/10/2022REGISTER#:217CASHIER:ADONATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cordoneda Lourdes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080168AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:KLIGLER, JOSHUA C, ESQ66 WEST FLAGLER STREET SUITE #400MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DADE COUNTY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C