This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 05:40:23 (UTC).

D & K REHAB CENTER INC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 D K REHAB CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D & K REHAB CENTER INC

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Hernandez Santana, Hector De Lacario

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

White, Camille A.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

12/13/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

12/13/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

11/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Process

11/05/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Complaint

10/15/2019 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31743:3970; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330048AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3650040AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.