This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/30/2020 at 06:45:33 (UTC).

CUTLER RIDGE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 CUTLER RIDGE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUTLER RIDGE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Tanner, Hilda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Shelby L Cohen

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

09/06/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

05/10/2019 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Motion for Extension of Time

03/27/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/19/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Memorandum of Disposition

02/27/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/27/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/26/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

02/25/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Pre Trial Summons

01/25/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/17/2019 - Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31605:2027; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$250.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2019 REGISTER#:256CASHIER:JT1438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530009AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less