This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/15/2019 at 23:12:02 (UTC).

CRISIS RESPONSE GROUP, INC. VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 CRISIS RESPONSE GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISIS RESPONSE GROUP, INC.

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jasiel Tabares

Gonzalez, Lisa S

Defendant Attorneys

Noah S Bender

Edwards, Brendalyn, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

08/07/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/24/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion/petit for Enforcement

07/22/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Notice:

06/18/2019 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

05/07/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

04/22/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Answer and Affirmative Defense

04/22/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

04/01/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

04/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

03/12/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

02/06/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/06/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/06/2019 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

02/06/2019 - Email Notice:

Complaint

02/06/2019 - Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790062AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$120.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2019 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540024AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JASIEL TABARES TABARES LAW, P.A. 12150 SW 128TH CT, STE 131 MIAMI FL 33186-4673 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.