This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 08:50:41 (UTC).

CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CO VS KAYSHEILA MICHON UNDERWOOD ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON MORTGAGE SECURITIES CO filed an Other lawsuit against KAYSHEILA MICHON UNDERWOOD. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Co

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Michon Underwood, Kaysheila

Underwood, Kaysheila M

Underwood, Kaysheila

Kaysheila M Underwood Irrevocable Trus

Miami Dade County A Political Subdivision Of The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

05/24/2023 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Hearing-

04/14/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

04/12/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Proof of Publication

04/03/2023 - Proof of Publication

Motion to Set Aside Default

04/03/2023 - Motion to Set Aside Default

Notice of Appearance

03/30/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

03/22/2023 - Notice:

Affidavit of Constructive Service

03/22/2023 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Notice:

03/14/2023 - Notice:

Order of Default

03/14/2023 - Order of Default

Non-Military Affidavit

03/14/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

03/14/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

03/14/2023 - Motion for Default

Order to File

03/12/2023 - Order to File

Order:

03/12/2023 - Order:

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/03/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 8:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 5/31/2023 @8AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: "NOTICE OF ACTION ON ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING, ETCPUB DATE: 4-28-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Constructive Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070130AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETHMCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITEORLANDO FL 32801-4326COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33568:2998; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less