This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/22/2021 at 06:56:47 (UTC).

COURTS AT SOUTH BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSN (THE) VS ALEJANDRO CRUZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 COURTS AT SOUTH BEACH CONDOMINIUM ASSN THE filed an Other lawsuit against ALEJANDRO CRUZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courts at South Beach Condominium Assn (The)

Assignor

Bank of America N.A.

Defendants

Cruz, Alejandro

Arrow Financial Services LLC

Alliance Recovery Systems LLC

Wells Fargo Bank NA

CRUZ, ALEJANDRO ALI

CRUZ, SAMANTHA

JIMENEZ, ANA

CRUZ, LENIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith F. Backer

Defendant Attorneys

Ramirez, Giorgio L

Wendy Tabb

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

01/07/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Affidavit of:

12/01/2020 - Affidavit of:

Non-Military Affidavit

12/01/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Appearance

11/25/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

10/16/2020 - Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s)

Motion for Default

10/13/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

10/13/2020 - Service Returned

Answer

10/13/2020 - Answer

Affidavit of:

10/02/2020 - Affidavit of:

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/23/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Certificate of Service

09/22/2020 - Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

09/22/2020 - Certificate of Service

Affidavit of:

09/02/2020 - Affidavit of:

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

08/24/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

08/21/2020 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550246AMT PAID:$2.50 NAME:KEITH F. BACKER 400 S DIXIE HWY STE 420 BOCA RATON FL 33432-6023 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$2.50 RECEIPT DATE:01/08/2021 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32278:718; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Wendy Tabb; Ramirez Giorgio L; Keith F. Backer; Cruz Alejandro; Wells Fargo Bank NA; Arrow Financial Services LLC; Alliance Recovery Systems LLC; CRUZ ALEJANDRO ALI; JIMENEZ ANA; CRUZ SAMANTHA; CRUZ LENIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: IMPROPER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: THE ESTATE Parties: Ramirez Giorgio L; Cruz Alejandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620279AMT PAID:$416.50 NAME:KEITH F. BACKER 400 S DIXIE HWY STE 420 BOCA RATON FL 33432-6023 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50 3142-RECORDING FEE1$8.00$8.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$416.50 RECEIPT DATE:08/22/2020 REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alliance Recovery Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant