This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 16:41:34 (UTC).

COUNTY LINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 COUNTY LINE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County Line Chiropractic Center Inc

Assignor

Chambers, Jacqua

Defendant

Progressive American Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Krzykwa (esq)

Michael P Brodi

Defendant Attorney

HERNANDEZ, CRISTINA, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/06/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/06/2022 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/06/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/06/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/06/2022 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

06/03/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

06/15/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120067AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI2875 NE 191 STREET SUITE 704AVENTURA FL 33180-2843COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/18/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Progressive American Ins Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040328AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:MICHAEL P BRODI2875 NE 191 STREET SUITE 704AVENTURA FL 33180-2843COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:05/07/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where County Line Chiropractic Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNANDEZ, CRISTINA, ESQ