This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2021 at 01:23:24 (UTC).

CORAL DEL MAR (LLC) VS DERRICK WHITE ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 CORAL DEL MAR LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DERRICK WHITE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coral Del Mar (LLC)

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

White, Derrick

Sain, Jaime

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaye-Ann M Baxter

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted

10/07/2021 - Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted

Writ of Possession Issued

09/22/2021 - Writ of Possession Issued

Default Final Judgment

09/15/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Default

09/14/2021 - Default

Default

09/14/2021 - Default

Motion for Default Judgment

08/31/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

08/31/2021 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

08/31/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

08/27/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/27/2021 - Service Returned

Non-Military Affidavit

08/25/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

08/25/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Complaint

08/18/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/18/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Returned Unexecuted; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: White Derrick; Sain Jaime

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: White Derrick; Sain Jaime

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32751:1610; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF POSSESSION Parties: White Derrick; Sain Jaime

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: White Derrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sain Jaime

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sain Jaime

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: White Derrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2390022AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2021 REGISTER#:239CASHIER:TWYLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2390021AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2021 REGISTER#:239CASHIER:TWYLAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960194AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:KAYE-ANN M BAXTER 5220 S UNIVERSITY DR STE C-110 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33328-5317 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/19/2021 REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less