This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/25/2022 at 07:49:08 (UTC).

C.O.R. INJURY CENTERS OF HOMESTEAD INC. VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 C O R INJURY CENTERS OF HOMESTEAD INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C.O.R. INJURY CENTERS OF HOMESTEAD INC.

Assignor

Sanchez, Reymi

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/22/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

11/22/2022 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

11/28/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/08/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090029AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100315AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:11/28/2022REGISTER#:210CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOMESTEAD is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.