This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 22:46:54 (UTC).

COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD, INC. VS THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cor Injury Centers Of Hollywood, Inc.

Defendant

The Travelers Casualty Company

Assignee

Ponce, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levine, Mark Aaron

Defendant Attorney

AGUIRRE, NICHOLAS A

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim

06/17/2022 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/22/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

06/17/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

06/17/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

06/17/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request:

07/22/2022 - Request:

Notice:

07/22/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/22/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Witness List

07/22/2022 - Witness List

Witness List

07/22/2022 - Witness List

Exhibit List

07/22/2022 - Exhibit List

Request:

07/22/2022 - Request:

Request:

07/22/2022 - Request:

Motion for Extension of Time

07/20/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

07/20/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/11/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110055AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:LEVINE, MARK AARON1150 NW 72 AVENUE, SUITE 600MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/23/2022REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: The Travelers Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220052AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:LEVINE, MARK AARON1150 NW 72 AVENUE, SUITE 600MIAMI FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/22/2022REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COR INJURY CENTERS OF HOLLYWOOD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levine, Mark Aaron