Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/13/2019 at 13:10:23 (UTC).

CONTEXT MEDICAL GROUP, INC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 CONTEXT MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTEXT MEDICAL GROUP, INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

JULUS, MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bennett, Scott B.

Defendant Attorney

Cabrera, Cristina M.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

05/31/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/21/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

05/03/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/19/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Voluntary Dismissal

02/26/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice:

02/21/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/15/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

01/15/2019 - Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

01/11/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Filing:

06/12/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Voluntary Dismissal

02/26/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/23/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Appearance

02/21/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

01/24/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

01/15/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

01/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/15/2019 - Request for Production

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31643:3308; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECORD FO TIME SHEET AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRELIMINARY ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: AS TO BENEFITS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31344:491; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3590026AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:BENNETT, SCOTT B. 3377 SW 3RD AVE MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Context Medical Group, Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bennett, Scott B.