This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 08:08:23 (UTC).

CONMED CORPORATION VS RELIFE MIAMI INSTITUTE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 CONMED CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RELIFE MIAMI INSTITUTE LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conmed Corporation

Defendants

ReLife Miami Institute LLC

Gelbard (Personal Guarantor), Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Batta, Ravi

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/04/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/04/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/10/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/10/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/11/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order to Serve Defendant

06/13/2022 - Order to Serve Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order to Serve Defendant; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: ReLife Miami Institute LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Gelbard (Personal Guarantor) Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000176AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2022REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Gelbard (Personal Guarantor) Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ReLife Miami Institute LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980139AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2022REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060032AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BATTA, RAVI21490 W DIXIE HWYAVENTURA FL 33180-1144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/08/2022REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conmed, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATTA, RAVI