This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 22:11:12 (UTC).

COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI VS MIGUEL A PEREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIGUEL A PEREZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI

Defendants

PEREZ, MIGUEL A

PEREZ, ERCIDIZ

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY

PEREZ, MIGUEL ANGEL

PEREZ, ERCIDIZ W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Michael Dilts

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/27/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/27/2022 - Complaint

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/27/2022 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Lis Pendens

06/30/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/13/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Final Disposition Document

07/29/2022 - Final Disposition Document

Voluntary Dismissal

07/29/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33314:2391; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEREZ MIGUEL A; PEREZ ERCIDIZ; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY; PEREZ MIGUEL ANGEL; PEREZ ERCIDIZ W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: PEREZ MIGUEL A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040067AMT PAID:$916.00NAME:DAVID MICHAEL DILTSALBERTELLI LAW PO BOX 23028TAMPA FL 33623-2028COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$916.00RECEIPT DATE:07/01/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33268:739; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Compu-Link Corporation of Mi is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Dilts