This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/28/2021 at 14:27:54 (UTC).

CM TRUST LLC VS FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CM TRUST LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against FLORIDA POWER LIGHT COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CM TRUST LLC

Defendants

FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corona, Ricardo R.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/18/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/18/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/22/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Amended Complaint

12/09/2021 - Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

12/09/2021 - Amended Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/16/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/17/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050030AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CORONA, RICARDO R.6700 SW 38 STMIAMI FL 33155COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/21/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100142AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CORONA, RICARDO R.6700 SW 38 STMIAMI FL 33155COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2021REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3060027AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CORONA, RICARDO R.6700 SW 38 STMIAMI FL 33155COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:11/24/2021REGISTER#:306CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100133AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:CORONA, RICARDO R.6700 SW 38 STMIAMI FL 33155COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/20/2021REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corona, Ricardo R.