This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/05/2023 at 06:18:35 (UTC).

CLEANA FRANCOIS VS AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 CLEANA FRANCOIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francois, Cleana

Defendant

American Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clement, Ashle-Ann

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Request for Production

02/01/2023 - Request for Production

Complaint

02/01/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

02/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Order Extending Time for

02/27/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

02/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

02/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

04/28/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33685:2626; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: American Security Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190035AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CLEMENT, ASHLE-ANNPALMERS LAW, P.A. 2455 E. SUNRISE BLVD #64 SUITE 4FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/04/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: American Security Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160042AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:CLEMENT, ASHLE-ANNPALMERS LAW, P.A. 2455 E. SUNRISE BLVD #64 SUITE 4FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/03/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less