*************A-01
02/01/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Contract - Debt Collection
Miami-Dade, Florida
Francois, Cleana
American Security Insurance Company
Clement, Ashle-Ann
02/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
02/01/2023 - Request for Production
02/01/2023 - Complaint
02/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
02/03/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued
02/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance
02/27/2023 - Order Extending Time for
02/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time
02/27/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time
04/28/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal
04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline
DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33685:2626; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: American Security Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSE
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190035AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CLEMENT, ASHLE-ANNPALMERS LAW, P.A. 2455 E. SUNRISE BLVD #64 SUITE 4FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/04/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: American Security Insurance Company
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160042AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:CLEMENT, ASHLE-ANNPALMERS LAW, P.A. 2455 E. SUNRISE BLVD #64 SUITE 4FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33304COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/03/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event
[-] Read Less