This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/28/2023 at 14:16:49 (UTC).

CLAUDIA TORRES-RESTREPO VS SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 CLAUDIA TORRES-RESTREPO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Santovenia, Maria de Jesus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Santovenia, Maria de Jesus

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES-RESTREPO, CLAUDIA

Defendants

SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC.

DOE, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faye, Laurence D.

Defendant Attorney

Carney, Michael John

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/11/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/11/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

08/24/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Service Returned

11/02/2022 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

11/22/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

11/23/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

11/23/2022 - Email Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

11/23/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Setting CM Deadline

12/12/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

04/21/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Motion:

05/04/2023 - Motion:

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/16/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

05/31/2023 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hearing-

06/07/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC.S, MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT, SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP, INC.SMOTION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08/10/2023 AT 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 06-30-2023 @ 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Carney Michael John; SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250017AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/24/2022REGISTER#:225CASHIER:BEPEREZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: TORRES-RESTREPO CLAUDIA; SOUTH FLORIDA SECURITY GROUP INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130061AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FAYE, LAURENCE D.PO BOX 453824MIAMI FL 33245-3824COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/16/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less