Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/04/2019 at 20:32:29 (UTC).

CJ FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 CJ FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CJ Family Chiropractic Center, LLC

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Toppin, Rose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Jarred S Dichek

Dichek, Jarred S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Sanctions

08/21/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

08/21/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

08/21/2019 - Motion:

Motion for Extension of Time

06/06/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/20/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Demand for Jury Trial

05/06/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Compliance

05/06/2019 - Notice of Compliance

Order:

04/30/2019 - Order:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/30/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

04/30/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Appearance

04/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

04/25/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

03/21/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

02/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

01/04/2019 - Statement of Claim

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2420016AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/21/2019 REGISTER#:242CASHIER:IRIARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3370034AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/05/2019 REGISTER#:337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CJ Family Chiropractic Center LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant