This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 18:45:22 (UTC).

CJ FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, LLC VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 CJ FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cj Family Chiropractic Center, Llc

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Mele, Marine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/13/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/17/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190072AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/18/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120042AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/14/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less