This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 16:09:45 (UTC).

CITY OF MIAMI VS DELIA HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 CITY OF MIAMI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DELIA HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF MIAMI

Defendant

DELIA HOSPITALITY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dooley, Rachel S.G.

Defendant Attorneys

Osorio, Carlos Federico

Barroso, Evelyn M., ESQ

Prado, Rafael

Rubio, Xavier Anibal

Zaffuto, Warren D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/10/2021 - Complaint

Order for Substitution of Counsel

05/04/2022 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

05/02/2022 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Motion for Extension of Time

04/27/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Filing:

03/25/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Response:

03/18/2022 - Response:

Notice of Hearing-

02/15/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

02/08/2022 - Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

02/07/2022 - Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

12/06/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

11/19/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

11/19/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/27/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Order Extending Time for

10/26/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

10/22/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

10/20/2021 - Service Returned

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: THIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 03-29-2022 AT 10AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Barroso Evelyn M. ESQ; DELIA HOSPITALITY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Osorio Carlos Federico; DELIA HOSPITALITY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: DELIA HOSPITALITY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2990169AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DOOLEY, RACHEL S.G.444 SW 2ND AVE STE 945MIAMI FL 33130-1910COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/21/2021REGISTER#:299CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2940047AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:DOOLEY, RACHEL S.G.444 SW 2ND AVE STE 945MIAMI FL 33130-1910COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2021REGISTER#:294CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zaffuto, Warren D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barroso, Evelyn M., ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Osorio, Carlos Federico