This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 13:39:01 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC VS PATRICIO URRUTIA SIVORI ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICIO URRUTIA SIVORI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CitiMortgage Inc

Defendants

Sivori, Patricio Urrutia

Urrutia Sivori, Patricio Pedro Jesus

Skyline on Brickell Condominium Association Inc

United States of America Department of the Treasur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molly Emma Carey

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned - No Service

11/23/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

11/23/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Summons Returned - No Service

11/23/2022 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice:

11/22/2022 - Notice:

Service Returned

11/03/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/03/2022 - Service Returned

Answer

10/19/2022 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/23/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

09/21/2022 - Lis Pendens

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070056AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:MOLLY EMMA CAREY6267 OLD WATER OAK ROAD, SUITE 203TALLAHASSEE FL 32312-3858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:09/27/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14. Parties: United States of America Department of the Treasur

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130123AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:MOLLY EMMA CAREY6267 OLD WATER OAK ROAD, SUITE 203TALLAHASSEE FL 32312-3858COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:09/22/2022REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33394:1865; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKYLINE ON BRICKELL CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carey, Molly E