Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/02/2021 at 20:08:15 (UTC).

CITIBANK (NA) VS RAMON GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 CITIBANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMON GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank (NA)

Defendant

Gonzalez, Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Thiel Debski

 

Court Documents

Pre Trial Summons

03/18/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

02/19/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

02/19/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/19/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-7 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2370029AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/24/2021 REGISTER#:237CASHIER:SERRAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600195AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI PO BOX 47718 JACKSONVILLE FL 32247-7718 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $4278.43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel