Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/09/2021 at 16:08:15 (UTC).

CICERO ORTHO-MED CENTER, INC. VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 CICERO ORTHO-MED CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Joseph Caleb Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cicero Ortho-Med Center, Inc.

Assignor

Lopez, Melissa

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Estevez, Marisol

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

05/18/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

05/03/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Appearance

04/15/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Admissions

04/15/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/15/2021 - Request for Production

Statement of Claim

04/15/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: Caleb Courtroom 2-2 5400 N.W. 22nd Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160002AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL 4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030 MIAMI FL 33137-3232 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2021 REGISTER#:216CASHIER:ILIVEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700011AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:ESTEVEZ, MARISOL 4770 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 1030 MIAMI FL 33137-3232 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/16/2021 REGISTER#:270CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cicero Ortho-Med Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estevez, Marisol