This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/10/2022 at 17:08:39 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN HUNTER VS YAMIL DANILO MORALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 CHRISTIAN HUNTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YAMIL DANILO MORALES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNTER, CHRISTIAN

Defendants

MORALES, YAMIL DANILO

RASIER (FL) LLC.

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/24/2021 - Complaint

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/23/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/08/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/08/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/08/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

12/03/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

12/03/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

12/03/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

12/03/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

12/03/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

12/03/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

12/03/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

12/03/2021 - Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

12/03/2021 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/03/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/03/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: MORALES YAMIL DANILO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: RASIER (FL) LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120117AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:12/08/2021REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3050143AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:11/25/2021REGISTER#:305CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jorge J Garcia