This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 01:47:36 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN CONTI VS CITY OF MIAMI BEACH ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 CHRISTIAN CONTI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI BEACH. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conti, Christian

Defendants

City Of Miami Beach

Gelber, Dan

Steinberg, Micky

Meiner, Steven

Samuelian, Mark

Gongora, Michael

Richardson, David

Arriola, Ricky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zincone, Francesco Antonio, III

Defendant Attorney

Enrique D Arana

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

07/22/2022 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

07/05/2022 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Order:

07/03/2022 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

06/06/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

AgreedOrder

04/29/2022 - AgreedOrder

Notice:

04/28/2022 - Notice:

Motion for Continuance

04/18/2022 - Motion for Continuance

Response to Motion

04/18/2022 - Response to Motion

Motion:

04/18/2022 - Motion:

AgreedOrder

04/18/2022 - AgreedOrder

Motion for Continuance

01/10/2022 - Motion for Continuance

Order:

01/10/2022 - Order:

Mediators Report

11/01/2021 - Mediators Report

Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

09/03/2021 - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss

Order:

10/16/2021 - Order:

Motion to Stay

10/15/2021 - Motion to Stay

Notice of Interrogatory

09/29/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce

09/28/2021 - Notice of Appt of Medtr&cnfrnce

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: FAIRNESS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXECUTED STIPULATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CALENDAR CALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2620158AMT PAID:$408.50NAME:ZINCONE, FRANCESCO ANTONIO, III4960 S.W. 72 AVENUE SUITE 206MIAMI FL 33155COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.50TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$408.50RECEIPT DATE:11/18/2020REGISTER#:262CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCESCO ZINCONE