This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/04/2022 at 05:44:38 (UTC).

CHOICE PLUS LLC VS KATHERINE LADRIG

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 CHOICE PLUS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATHERINE LADRIG. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Choice Plus LLC

Defendant

LaDrig, Katherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farrar, Michael

 

Court Documents

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/18/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/19/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/17/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/17/2021 - Complaint

Service Returned

04/08/2021 - Service Returned

Motion for Summary Judgment

04/11/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Hearing-

04/11/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

04/11/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Notice of Hearing-

04/12/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Non-Military Affidavit

04/29/2021 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Judgment

05/17/2021 - Motion for Default Judgment

Order of Default

05/17/2021 - Order of Default

Default Final Judgment

05/25/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Memorandum of Disposition

05/25/2021 - Memorandum of Disposition

Default Final Judgment

05/25/2021 - Default Final Judgment

Default Final Judgment

05/25/2021 - Default Final Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 32532:3859; Event Type: Event; Comments: $8,268.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 4:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: KATHERINE LADRIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/17/2021 - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05-17-2021AT 4:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LaDrig Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540042AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FARRAR, MICHAEL175 SW 7TH STREET SUITE 2000MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/20/2021REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LaDrig Katherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2560018AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:FARRAR, MICHAEL175 SW 7TH STREET SUITE 2000MIAMI FL 33130COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:03/19/2021REGISTER#:256CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Choice Plus LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farrar, Michael, ESQ.