This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/18/2019 at 07:12:46 (UTC).

CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, PL VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, PL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHIROPRACTIC CLINICS OF SOUTH FLORIDA, PL

Assignor

Clark, Michelle

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignor Attorneys

Angelica M Gentile, Esq

Andrew J. Shamis, Esq

Defendant Attorney

Courtney Drew

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

05/22/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion in Limine

05/22/2019 - Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

05/22/2019 - Motion in Limine

Motion to Compel

05/22/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Leave

05/22/2019 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/22/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/22/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

04/10/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

01/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Interrogatory

05/22/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/22/2019 - Request for Production

Motion for Leave

05/22/2019 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Default

05/22/2019 - Motion for Default

Notice of Interrogatory

04/10/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/10/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/10/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request:

04/02/2019 - Request:

Request for Production

04/02/2019 - Request for Production

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31463:3748; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440148AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:ANGELICA M GENTILE, ESQ 14 NE 1ST AVE STE 400 MIAMI FL 33132-2404 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510052AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:ANGELICA M GENTILE, ESQ 14 NE 1ST AVE STE 400 MIAMI FL 33132-2404 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chiropractic Clinics of South Florida PL is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shamis, Andrew J