This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/07/2020 at 08:23:44 (UTC).

CHIROPRACTIC & ACUPUNCTURE MEDICAL CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CHIROPRACTIC ACUPUNCTURE MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chiropractic & Acupuncture Medical Center

Defendants

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Thomas T Mang D.C., P.A.

Assignee

Dunstan, Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Narcy Fajardo, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

07/14/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

05/07/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request:

04/09/2019 - Request:

Request for Admissions

04/09/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

04/09/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/09/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Extension of Time

04/05/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/01/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

03/18/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order of Recusal

03/15/2019 - Order of Recusal

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/15/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

03/14/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

SP Pretrial Date

01/28/2019 - SP Pretrial Date

Statement of Claim

01/02/2019 - Statement of Claim

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31533:1374; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Recusal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120014AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440080AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR. 9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306 MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less